PA SB273 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Signed in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 21, 2013 (P.L.32, No.10), known as the Community-Based Health Care Act, in health care assistance, further providing for Community-Based Health Care Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In health care assistance, further providing for Community-Based Health Care Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 273 PN 224, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 273 PN 224, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21HouseSigned in House
2020-10-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-10-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-19HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-19HouseSecond consideration
2020-09-30HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-29HouseReported as committed
2020-07-08HouseReferred to HEALTH
2020-06-29HouseIn the House
2020-06-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-04-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-21SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-20SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-20SenateReported as committed
2019-02-07SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=273
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0273&pn=0224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=04/20/2020&RollCallId=795
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=1014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2515
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1680

Bill Comments

feedback