PA SB27 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-25 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-25 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, further providing for dog purchaser protection.
Title
Further providing for dog purchaser protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] |
Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] | Sen. Daylin Leach [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - SB 27 PN 1241, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2011-05-24 | House | In the House |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-01-12 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |