PA SB269 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 6A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 6A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Title
Making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 269 PN 246, FP (Y: 176 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 269 PN 246, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 269 PN 246, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 6A of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (176-25) |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | In the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |