PA SB269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for Uniform Construction Code Review and Advisory Council and providing for review of updated sections and adoption of updated sections into Uniform Construction Code; in Uniform Construction Code, further providing for revised or successor codes; in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement; in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for education and training programs; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for Uniform Construction Code Review and Advisory Council and providing for review of updated sections and adoption of updated sections into Uniform Construction Code; in Uniform Construction Code, further providing for revised or successor codes; in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement; in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for education and training programs; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 269 PN 874, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 269 PN 755, A1355, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-1355 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 269 PN 755, A1355, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-1355 (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-05-24 | House | In the House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-10) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (36-14) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |