PA SB268 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 5A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 5A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 7, 1972 (P.L.743, No.176), entitled "An act providing for the establishment and operation of Lincoln University as an instrumentality of the Commonwealth to serve as a State-related institution in the higher education system of the Commonwealth; providing for change of name; providing for the composition of the board of trustees; terms of trustees, and the power and duties of such trustees; providing for preference to Pennsylvania residents in tuition; authorizing appropriations in amounts to be fixed annually by the General Assembly; providing for the auditing of accounts of expenditures from said appropriations; providing for public support and capital improvements; authorizing the issuance of bonds exempt from taxation within the Commonwealth; requiring the President to make an annual report of the operations of Lincoln University," making an appropriation for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of the appropriation; providing for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated; and providing for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 7, 1972 (P.L.743, No.176), entitled "An act providing for the establishment and operation of Lincoln University as an instrumentality of the Commonwealth to serve as a State-related institution in the higher education system of the Commonwealth; providing for change of name; providing for the composition of the board of trustees; terms of trustees, and the power and duties of such trustees; providing for preference to Pennsylvania residents in tuition; authorizing appropriations in amounts to be fixed annually by the General Assembly; providing for the auditing of accounts of expenditures from said appropriations; providing for public support and capital improvements; authorizing the issuance of bonds exempt from taxation within the Commonwealth; requiring the President to make an annual report of the operations of Lincoln University," making an appropriation for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of the appropriation; providing for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated; and providing for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 268 PN 245, FP (Y: 193 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 268 PN 245, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 268 PN 245, FP (Y: 193 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 268 PN 245, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 5A of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-8) |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | In the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |