PA SB266 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 3A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 3A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), entitled "An act providing for the establishment and operation of the University of Pittsburgh as an instrumentality of the Commonwealth to serve as a State-related university in the higher education system of the Commonwealth; providing for change of name; providing for the composition of the board of trustees; terms of trustees, and the power and duties of such trustees; authorizing appropriations in amounts to be fixed annually by the General Assembly; providing for the auditing of accounts of expenditures from said appropriations; providing for public support and capital improvements; authorizing the issuance of bonds exempt from taxation within the Commonwealth; requiring the chancellor to make an annual report of the operations of the University of Pittsburgh," making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), entitled "An act providing for the establishment and operation of the University of Pittsburgh as an instrumentality of the Commonwealth to serve as a State-related university in the higher education system of the Commonwealth; providing for change of name; providing for the composition of the board of trustees; terms of trustees, and the power and duties of such trustees; authorizing appropriations in amounts to be fixed annually by the General Assembly; providing for the auditing of accounts of expenditures from said appropriations; providing for public support and capital improvements; authorizing the issuance of bonds exempt from taxation within the Commonwealth; requiring the chancellor to make an annual report of the operations of the University of Pittsburgh," making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 266 PN 243, FP (Y: 150 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 266 PN 243, 2021 A2106, SUSP RULES, COX (Y: 50 N: 151 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 266 PN 243, Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 266 PN 243, 2021 A2106, SUSP RULES, COX (Y: 50 N: 151 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 266 PN 243, Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 3A of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (150-51) |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | In the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-5) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |