PA SB265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 2A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 2A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of April 1, 1863 (P.L.213, No.227), entitled "An act to accept the grant of Public Lands, by the United States, to the several states, for the endowment of Agricultural Colleges," making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure; and making an appropriation from a restricted account within the Agricultural College Land Scrip Fund.
Title
A Supplement to the act of April 1, 1863 (P.L.213, No.227), entitled "An act to accept the grant of Public Lands, by the United States, to the several states, for the endowment of Agricultural Colleges," making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure; and making an appropriation from a restricted account within the Agricultural College Land Scrip Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 265 PN 242, FP (Y: 185 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 265 PN 242, 2021 A2051, SUSP RULES, COX (Y: 39 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 265 PN 242, 2021 A2084, SUSP RULES, JONES (Y: 40 N: 161 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 265 PN 242, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 265 PN 242, FP (Y: 185 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 265 PN 242, 2021 A2051, SUSP RULES, COX (Y: 39 N: 162 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 265 PN 242, 2021 A2084, SUSP RULES, JONES (Y: 40 N: 161 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 265 PN 242, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 2A of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-16) |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | In the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |