PA SB263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for applications for official absentee ballots.
Title
In voting by qualified absentee electors, further providing for applications for official absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 263 PN 245, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-27 | House | In the House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-11-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |