PA SB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Borough of Topton, Berks County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Borough of Topton, Berks County.
Title
Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Borough of Topton, Berks County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Borough of Topton, Berks County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 26 PN 5, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-05 | House | In the House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |