PA SB256 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1988 (P.L.556, No.101), known as the Municipal Waste Planning, Recycling and Waste Reduction Act, in recycling and waste reduction, further providing for Commonwealth recycling and waste reduction.
Title
In recycling and waste reduction, further providing for Commonwealth recycling and waste reduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |