PA SB252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in parking authorities, providing for granting of interests and mixed-use projects for authorities in cities of the second class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In parking authorities, providing for granting of interests and mixed-use projects for authorities in cities of the second class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 252 PN 232, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 252 PN 232, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13HousePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13HouseSigned in House
2017-12-13HouseSigned in Senate
2017-12-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-12HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-06HouseReported as committed
2017-09-21HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-09-19HouseIn the House
2017-09-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-09-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as committed
2017-01-27SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=252
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0252&pn=0232
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=250
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/18/2017&RollCallId=431
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1103
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1184
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=956

Bill Comments

feedback