PA SB25 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-13)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, further providing for title, for definitions, for State Board of Nursing, for dietitian-nutritionist license required, for unauthorized practices and acts not prohibited, for temporary practice permit, for graduates of schools of other states, territories or Dominion of Canada, for persons entitled to practice, for certified registered nurse practitioners and qualifications, for scope of practice for certified registered nurse practitioners, for prescriptive authority for certified registered nurse practitioners, for Drug Review Committee, for professional liability, for reporting of multiple licensure, for continuing nursing education, for punishment for violations, for refusal, suspension or revocation of license, for reinstatement of license and for injunction or other process; and providing for the expiration of the State Board of Nursing's power to license certified registered nurse practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for title, for definitions, for State Board of Nursing, for dietitian-nutritionist license required, for unauthorized practices and acts not prohibited, for temporary practice permit, for graduates of schools of other states, territories or Dominion of Canada, for persons entitled to practice, for certified registered nurse practitioners and qualifications, for scope of practice for certified registered nurse practitioners, for prescriptive authority for certified registered nurse practitioners, for Drug Review Committee, for professional liability, for reporting of multiple licensure, for continuing nursing education, for punishment for violations, for refusal, suspension or revocation of license, for reinstatement of license and for injunction or other process; and providing for the expiration of the State Board of Nursing's power to license certified registered nurse practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 25 PN 507, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-06-12HouseIn the House
2019-06-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (44-6)
2019-06-10SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03SenateSecond consideration
2019-03-27SenateFirst consideration
2019-03-27SenateReported as amended
2019-02-27SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=25
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0025&pn=0334
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0025&pn=0507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=80
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=244
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=115

Bill Comments

feedback