PA SB25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, further providing for definitions, for State Board of Nursing, for dietitian-nutritionist license required, for temporary practice permit, for graduates of schools of other states, territories or Dominion of Canada, for certified registered nurse practitioners, for scope of practice for certified registered nurse practitioners, for prescriptive authority for certified registered nurse practitioners, for Drug Review Committee and for professional liability; and providing for the expiration of the State Board of Nursing's power to license certified registered nurse practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for State Board of Nursing, for dietitian-nutritionist license required, for temporary practice permit, for graduates of schools of other states, territories or Dominion of Canada, for certified registered nurse practitioners, for scope of practice for certified registered nurse practitioners, for prescriptive authority for certified registered nurse practitioners, for Drug Review Committee and for professional liability; and providing for the expiration of the State Board of Nursing's power to license certified registered nurse practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 25 PN 314, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 25 PN 314, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-04-26HouseIn the House
2017-04-26SenateFinal passage (39-10)
2017-04-26SenateVote on final passage reconsidered
2017-04-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (38-11)
2017-04-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-24SenateSecond consideration
2017-04-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-18SenateReported as committed
2017-02-15SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=25
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0025&pn=0314
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=95
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/24/2017&RollCallId=115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=84
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=87

Bill Comments

feedback