PA SB247 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employees, repealing provisions relating to religious garb, insignia, etc., prohibited and penalty.
Title
In professional employees, repealing provisions relating to religious garb, insignia, etc., prohibited and penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 247 PN 215, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 247 PN 215, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-04-19 | House | In the House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |