PA SB243 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT
Pending: House Gaming Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in games of chance, providing for games of chance operations during disaster emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In games of chance, providing for games of chance operations during disaster emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 243 PN 688, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A00822: Vote on Amendment Passes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended: A00822 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A00822 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A00833: Vote on Amendment Fails (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT
2021-05-25HouseIn the House
2021-05-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2021-05-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-05-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-10SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-28SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-28SenateReported as amended
2021-02-22SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=243
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0243&pn=0223
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0243&pn=0688
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0243P0688.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=04/28/2021&RollCallId=155
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=04/28/2021&RollCallId=154
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=04/28/2021&RollCallId=163
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=04/28/2021&RollCallId=162
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=210
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=116

Bill Comments 750

feedback