PA SB241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1959 (P.L.1913, No.694), known as the Equal Pay Law, further providing for wage rates; and providing for preemption.
Title
Further providing for wage rates; and providing for preemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 297, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 281, A169, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-0169 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 281, A126, WILLIAMS AMENDMENT NO. A-0126 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 281, A127, WILLIAMS AMENDMENT NO. A-0127 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 281, A169, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-0169 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 281, A126, WILLIAMS AMENDMENT NO. A-0126 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 241 PN 281, A127, WILLIAMS AMENDMENT NO. A-0127 (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-02-08 | House | In the House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-14) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (35-14) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |