PA SB234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, authorizing assessments for energy improvements in districts designated by municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing assessments for energy improvements in districts designated by municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: SB 234 PN 1443, FP (Y: 163 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 234 PN 1443, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseAct No. 30
2018-06-12HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-05HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-04HouseSigned in House
2018-06-04HouseSigned in Senate
2018-05-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (163-28)
2018-05-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-05-22HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-22HouseSecond consideration
2018-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-01HouseReported as committed
2018-02-01HouseReferred to COMMERCE
2018-01-30HouseIn the House
2018-01-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (42-8)
2018-01-29SenateRe-reported as amended
2017-12-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-10-24SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-24SenateReported as amended
2017-01-31SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=234
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0234&pn=0255
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0234&pn=1286
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0234&pn=1376
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0234&pn=1443
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=10/24/2017&RollCallId=515
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/29/2018&RollCallId=636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1503
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=1562

Bill Comments

feedback