PA SB217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 16, 1992 (P.L.155, No.28), known as the Assessors Certification Act, repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability; and providing for assessors in counties of the first class.
Title
Repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability; and providing for assessors in counties of the first class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |