PA SB211 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, further providing for definitions, for prize limits, for insured games, for limited sales, for recordkeeping, for eligible organizations' use of locations for conducting small games of chance, for separate individual prize limitations, for revocation of licenses and for advertising.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for prize limits, for insured games, for limited sales, for recordkeeping, for eligible organizations' use of locations for conducting small games of chance, for separate individual prize limitations, for revocation of licenses and for advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-05 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-24 | Second consideration | |
2009-09-23 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-04-28 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-01 | First consideration | |
2009-04-01 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to FINANCE |