PA SB210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-25 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2023-09-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |