PA SB202 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |