PA SB202 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 29, 2004 (P.L.1383, No.180), known as the Uniform Crime Reporting Act, in higher education security information, further providing for crime statistics and security policies and procedures; and providing for Pennsylvania safe campuses.
Title
In higher education security information, further providing for crime statistics and security policies and procedures; and providing for Pennsylvania safe campuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |