PA SB192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for powers and duties of commission and for accountability; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for license costs and fees and making an editorial change.
Title
In Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for powers and duties of commission and for accountability; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for license costs and fees and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Scott Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House Game And Fisheries: To Table (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 192 PN 224, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 192 PN 224, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2017-03-27 | House | In the House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |