PA SB189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in crime victims, further providing for rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In crime victims, further providing for rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 189 PN 178, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-05-21HouseIn the House
2018-05-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-04-23SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-17SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-17SenateReported as committed
2017-01-26SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback