PA SB178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in primary and election expenses, further providing for reporting by candidate and political committees and other persons, for late contributions and independent expenditures, for oath of compliance, perjury, disqualification from office and commercial use, for residual funds and for place of filing, providing for manner of filing and for inability to file reports or statements electronically by deadline and further providing for late filing fee and certificate of filing, for additional powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for reports by business entities and publication by Secretary of the Commonwealth.
Title
In primary and election expenses, further providing for reporting by candidate and political committees and other persons, for late contributions and independent expenditures, for oath of compliance, perjury, disqualification from office and commercial use, for residual funds and for place of filing, providing for manner of filing and for inability to file reports or statements electronically by deadline and further providing for late filing fee and certificate of filing, for additional powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for reports by business entities and publication by Secretary of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A975, DINNIMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-0975 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A1216, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-1216 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A1208, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-1208 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A1220, SABATINA AMENDMENT NO. A-1220 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A975, DINNIMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-0975 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A1216, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-1216 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A1208, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-1208 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 178 PN 681, A1220, SABATINA AMENDMENT NO. A-1220 (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-06 | House | In the House |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |