PA SB172 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices and providing for automated speed enforcement systems in active work zones and establishing a pilot program for automated speed enforcement system on designated highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices and providing for automated speed enforcement systems in active work zones and establishing a pilot program for automated speed enforcement system on designated highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 172 PN 2024, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A09356 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: SB 172 PN 2024, CONCUR (Y: 173 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 172 PN 1930, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: SB 172 PN 1866, FP (Y: 166 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: SB 172 PN 1238, 2017 A7246, HENNESSEY (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: SB 172 PN 1238, 2017 A4641, DELISSIO (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03861 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03785 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03786 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 172 PN 1067, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-09SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-09SenateSigned in House
2018-10-02SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-02SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (47-1)
2018-10-01SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-09-25SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2018-09-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the House (173-22)
2018-09-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2018-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-22HouseIn the House
2018-06-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (44-4)
2018-06-22SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2018-06-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (166-25)
2018-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-16HouseReported as amended
2017-07-11HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-07-10HouseIn the House
2017-07-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (45-3)
2017-07-09SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-30SenateRe-reported as amended
2017-04-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-18SenateRemoved from table
2017-03-22SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-01-24SenateFirst consideration
2017-01-24SenateReported as committed
2017-01-23SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=172
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0172&pn=0148
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0172&pn=1067
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0172&pn=1238
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0172&pn=1866
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0172&pn=1930
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0172&pn=2024
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/24/2017&RollCallId=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=392
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=246
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=981
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=982
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1302
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1303
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1320
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=1666
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=634
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1045
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1954
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1953
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1139
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=665

Bill Comments

feedback