PA SB169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in lobbying disclosure, further providing for registration, for reporting, for prohibited activities and for registration fees, fund established, system and regulations.
Title
In lobbying disclosure, further providing for registration, for reporting, for prohibited activities and for registration fees, fund established, system and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 169 PN 554, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 169 PN 145, A443, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-0443 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 169 PN 145, A443, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-0443 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-22 | House | In the House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |