PA SB168 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, in industry partnerships, further providing for definitions, for industry clusters, for interdepartmental cooperation and for industry and labor market research and providing for dissemination of industry and labor market research to educational institutions.
Title
In industry partnerships, further providing for definitions, for industry clusters, for interdepartmental cooperation and for industry and labor market research and providing for dissemination of industry and labor market research to educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |