PA SB156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 26, 2001 (P.L.755, No.77), known as the Tobacco Settlement Act, in medical assistance for workers with disabilities, further providing for definitions and for medical assistance benefits for workers with disabilities and workers with medically improved disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In medical assistance for workers with disabilities, further providing for definitions and for medical assistance benefits for workers with disabilities and workers with medically improved disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 156 PN 734, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 156 PN 734, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01HouseAct No. 69
2021-07-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25HouseSigned in House
2021-06-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-15HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-14HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-09HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-09HouseReported as committed
2021-05-17HouseReferred to HEALTH
2021-05-11HouseIn the House
2021-05-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2021-05-10SenateAmended on third consideration
2021-04-27SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-03-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-23SenateReported as committed
2021-02-02SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=156
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0156&pn=0135
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0156&pn=0734
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0156P0135.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/SB0156P0734.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=74
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=148
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=100
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=577
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=460
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=813

Bill Comments 750

feedback