PA SB152 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in general budget implementation, further providing for Department of Human Services.
Title
In general budget implementation, further providing for Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Failed Amendment A03541 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |