PA SB146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, providing for online training for firefighters; and making a related repeal.
Title
In Commonwealth services, providing for online training for firefighters; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 146 PN 1160, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: SB 146 PN 1160, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 146 PN 680, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 146 PN 1160, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: SB 146 PN 1160, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 146 PN 680, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 106 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-10-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-10-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-22 | House | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-05-06 | House | In the House |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |