PA SB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in school directors, further providing for school director training programs; in intermediate units, providing for school safety and security enhancements; in certification of teachers, further providing for continuing professional development, providing for trauma-informed education and further providing for postbaccalaureate certification and for Pennsylvania school leadership standards; in safe schools, further providing for Office for Safe Schools; in school safety and security, further providing for definitions, for School Safety and Security Committee, for survey of school safety and security, for School Safety and Security Grant Program, for Risk and Vulnerability Assessment Teams, for school safety and security coordinator and for school safety and security training and providing for trauma-informed approach; in Safe2Say Program, further providing for judicial proceeding and for annual report; providing for threat assessment; in school health services, further providing for confidentiality, transference and removal of health records; in early learning programs, further providing for duties of department; providing for the Keystone Telepresence Education Grant Program; in the State Board of Education, further providing for powers and duties of the board and for powers and duties of Council of Basic Education and Council of Higher Education; and providing for references to area career and technical school in statute and regulation.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in school directors, further providing for school director training programs; in intermediate units, providing for school safety and security enhancements; in certification of teachers, further providing for continuing professional development, providing for trauma-informed education and further providing for postbaccalaureate certification and for Pennsylvania school leadership standards; in safe schools, further providing for Office for Safe Schools; in school safety and security, further providing for definitions, for School Safety and Security Committee, for survey of school safety and security, for School Safety and Security Grant Program, for Risk and Vulnerability Assessment Teams, for school safety and security coordinator and for school safety and security training and providing for trauma-informed approach; in Safe2Say Program, further providing for judicial proceeding and for annual report; providing for threat assessment; in school health services, further providing for confidentiality, transference and removal of health records; in early learning programs, further providing for duties of department; providing for the Keystone Telepresence Education Grant Program; in the State Board of Education, further providing for powers and duties of the board and for powers and duties of Council of Basic Education and Council of Higher Education; and providing for references to area career and technical school in statute and regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 144 PN 1078, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 1078, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 144 PN 927, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01700 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 340, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 1078, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 144 PN 927, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01700 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 340, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 18 |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (197-0) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-06-27 | House | In the House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-04-09 | House | In the House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |