PA SB144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 24, 1966 (1965 P.L.1535, No.537), known as the Pennsylvania Sewage Facilities Act, further providing for official plans.
Title
Further providing for official plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 1051, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 144 PN 1051, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02436 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 96, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 144 PN 1051, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A02436 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 96, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Act No. 26 |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-1) |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-07-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2017-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-07 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-06-19 | House | In the House |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |