PA SB143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 6, 1989 (P.L.169, No.32), known as the Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act, in financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board.
Title
In financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 143 PN 95, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-05-09 | House | In the House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |