PA SB142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 14, 1952 (1951 P.L.1898, No.522), known as the Funeral Director Law, further providing for conduct of business by individuals and partnerships.
Title
Further providing for conduct of business by individuals and partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 142 PN 118, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2023-12-12 | House | In the House |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |