PA SB14 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statues, in sentencing, further providing for conditions of probation and for modification or revocation of order of probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statues, in sentencing, further providing for conditions of probation and for modification or revocation of order of probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 14 PN 1834, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2020-07-15HouseIn the House
2020-07-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-07-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-30SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-30SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-24SenateReported as amended
2019-01-24SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=14
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0014&pn=0059
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0014&pn=1819
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0014&pn=1834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=1017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=1061
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=605

Bill Comments

feedback