PA SB139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 31, 2006 (P.L.1210, No.133), known as the Price Gouging Act, further providing for definitions, for price gouging prohibited and for investigation.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for price gouging prohibited and for investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 139 PN 851, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 139 PN 851, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-06-04 | House | In the House |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-17) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |