PA SB137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.
Title
In Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 137 PN 91, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 137 PN 91, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2017-03-20 | House | In the House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |