PA SB135 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for dogs pursuing, injuring or killing big game.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In hunting and furtaking, further providing for dogs pursuing, injuring or killing big game.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor: SB 135 PN 116, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 135 PN 116, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseAct No. 11
2018-03-26HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-03-19HousePresented to the Governor
2018-03-13HouseSigned in House
2018-03-19HouseSigned in Senate
2018-03-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2018-03-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-02-06HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-02-06HouseSecond consideration
2018-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseFirst consideration
2018-01-23HouseReported as committed
2017-09-21HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2017-09-18HouseIn the House
2017-09-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2017-07-26SenateRemoved from table
2017-07-26SenateLaid on the table
2017-07-17SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-27SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-27SenateReported as committed
2017-01-20SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=135
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0135&pn=0116
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=06/27/2017&RollCallId=349
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=267
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1201
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1018
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/12/2018&RollCallId=1287

Bill Comments

feedback