PA SB1344 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-28 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-28 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in nomination of candidates, further providing for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries.
Title
In nomination of candidates, further providing for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-07-18 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |