PA SB1330 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preemptions, providing for regulation of firearms and ammunition.
Title
In preemptions, providing for regulation of firearms and ammunition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1330 PN 1978, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-18 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-17 | House | In the House |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-19) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |