PA SB1326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tax credit eligibility, further providing for definitions and for eligibility and providing for independent audit for tax credits, for additional requirements for certain tax credits, for independent audit for certain tax benefits, for additional requirements for tax benefits, for broker licensing, for tax credit administration, for tax benefit administration and for guidelines; in research and development tax credit, further providing for credit for research and development expenses and for report to General Assembly; in keystone innovation zones, further providing for keystone innovation zone tax credits and for annual report; and making editorial changes.
Title
In tax credit eligibility, further providing for definitions and for eligibility and providing for independent audit for tax credits, for additional requirements for certain tax credits, for independent audit for certain tax benefits, for additional requirements for tax benefits, for broker licensing, for tax credit administration, for tax benefit administration and for guidelines; in research and development tax credit, further providing for credit for research and development expenses and for report to General Assembly; in keystone innovation zones, further providing for keystone innovation zone tax credits and for annual report; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |