PA SB1282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 19, 1995 (P.L.33, No.3), known as the Economic Development Agency, Fiduciary and Lender Environmental Liability Protection Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1282 PN 1742, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1282 PN 1742, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2022-10-19 | House | In the House |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |