PA SB128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preemptions, providing for leave and compensation mandates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preemptions, providing for leave and compensation mandates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-20SenateRemoved from table
2017-06-20SenateLaid on the table
2017-05-10SenateRemoved from table
2017-05-10SenateLaid on the table
2017-03-27SenateRemoved from table
2017-03-27SenateLaid on the table
2017-01-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-01-25SenateReported as amended
2017-01-19SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback