PA SB1279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for essential family caregivers in facilities during disaster emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for essential family caregivers in facilities during disaster emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1279 PN 2099, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1279 PN 2001, A7740, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-7740 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1279 PN 2001, A7640, MENSCH AMENDMENT NO. A-7640 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-20HouseReferred to HEALTH
2020-10-19HouseIn the House
2020-10-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-16)
2020-10-19SenateAmended on third consideration (35-14)
2020-10-05SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-09-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-22SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-21SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-21SenateReported as amended
2020-09-03SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1279
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1279&pn=1917
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1279&pn=2001
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1279&pn=2099
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=09/21/2020&RollCallId=1130
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/05/2020&RollCallId=1195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=666
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=667
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=676

Bill Comments

feedback