PA SB1271 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in juvenile matters, further providing for definitions, for informal hearing and for disposition of dependent child.
Title
In juvenile matters, further providing for definitions, for informal hearing and for disposition of dependent child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1271 PN 1837, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-18 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-17 | House | In the House |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |