PA SB1271 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-18 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-18 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act itemizing public improvement projects for flood protection and flood damage repair to be constructed by the Department of General Services, together with their estimated financial costs; stating the estimated useful life of the projects; providing for the adoption of specific disaster mitigation or assistance projects to be financed from debt incurred under clause (1) or (4) of subsection (a) of section 7 of Article VIII of the Constitution of Pennsylvania; and making an appropriation.
Title
Itemizing public improvement projects for flood protection and flood damage repair to be constructed by the Department of General Services, together with their estimated financial costs; stating the estimated useful life of the projects; providing for the adoption of specific disaster mitigation or assistance projects to be financed from debt incurred under clause (1) or (4) of subsection (a) of section 7 of Article VIII of the Constitution of Pennsylvania; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-16 - Senate - SB 1271 PN 1796, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-18 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-11-16 | House | In the House |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |