PA SB1268 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 9, 1997 (P.L.169, No.14), known as the Nurse Aide Resident Abuse Prevention Training Act, providing for findings; further providing for definitions; providing for certification of COVID-19 temporary nurse aides; and making an editorial change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for findings; further providing for definitions; providing for certification of COVID-19 temporary nurse aides; and making an editorial change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: SB 1268 PN 1905, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1268 PN 1905, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 138
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-20HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-19HouseSigned in House
2020-11-18HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-11-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-21HouseSecond consideration
2020-10-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-10-19HouseLaid on the table
2020-10-19HouseFirst consideration
2020-10-19HouseReported as committed
2020-10-08HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2020-10-06HouseIn the House
2020-10-06SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-10-05SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-05SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-05SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-22SenateReported as committed
2020-08-31SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1268
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1268&pn=1905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=09/22/2020&RollCallId=1164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/05/2020&RollCallId=1194
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=660
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=2619
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1722
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=2635

Bill Comments

feedback