PA SB1264 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on February 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, providing for the definition of "geologist-in-training" and for the use of the terms "engineer" and "engineering"; further providing for general powers of the board and for procedure for licensing as professional geologist; and providing for continuing professional engineering competency and education requirements.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, providing for the definition of "geologist-in-training" and for the use of the terms "engineer" and "engineering"; further providing for general powers of the board and for procedure for licensing as professional geologist; and providing for continuing professional engineering competency and education requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-10 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-02-12 | First consideration | |
2008-02-12 | Reported as committed | |
2008-02-04 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1264 |