PA SB1248 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for financial education.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for financial education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-04 | First consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Reported as amended | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to EDUCATION |